NH HB137 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 05/06/2021; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 05/06/2021; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the rulemaking authority of the department of information technology.
Title
Relative to the rulemaking authority of the department of information technology.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynne Ober [R] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] | Rep. Tracy Emerick [R] |
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 05/06/2021; Senate Journal 14 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 05/06/2021; Senate Calendar 22 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 03/31/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-02-24 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 8 |
2021-02-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 5 |
2021-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2021 01:45 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/99308877767 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 36 |