NH HB1370 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 6/11/2014; Chapter 0100; Effective 8/10/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 6/11/2014; Chapter 0100; Effective 8/10/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for minority party membership on the executive committee of the county convention
Title
Providing for minority party membership on the executive committee of the county convention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/11/2014; Chapter 0100; Effective 8/10/2014 |
2014-05-15 | House | Enrolled |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-08 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1245s (Rep. Porter) Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1245s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1245s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1245s, 4/17/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Hearing: 3/19/14, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 10 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs |
2014-03-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0304h(NT) Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-05 | House | Adopt Amendment #0304h (NT) Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-25 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2014-0304h (New Title) |
2014-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0304h (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 13 |
2014-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 2/20/2014 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2014-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 1/28/2014 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Municipal and County Government |