NH HB1372 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-30 - Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-30 - Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Making an appropriation for the pediatric sexual assault nurse examiner training program.
Title
Making an appropriation for the pediatric sexual assault nurse examiner training program.
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Flockhart [D] | Rep. Carolyn Gargasz [R] | Rep. Caroletta Alicea [D] | Rep. Deanna Rollo [D] |
Rep. Ruth Gulick [D] | Sen. Peggy Gilmour [D] | Rep. Robert Nigrello [R] | Rep. Debra DeSimone [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-15 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 15 |
2014-05-29 | House | ==RECONVENE==Conference of Committee Meeting: 5/29/2014; 2:45 PM; Legislative Office Building 212 |
2014-05-23 | House | Conference of Committee Meeting: 5/28/2014; 10:00 Amendment; Legislative Office Building 212 ==RECESSED== |
2014-05-22 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Odell, Forrester, and Gilmour; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Forrester Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-21 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Leishman, Benn, Walz, Katherine Rogers |
2014-05-21 | House | Rep. Chandler moved to Non-Concur with Senate Amendment and request C of C; Motion Adopted Voice Vote (In recess of 5/15/2014) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1863s, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Sen. Odell Floor Amendment #2014-1863s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Sen. Bragdon moved Ought to Pass; Senate Journal 13 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 13 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 5/15/14; Senate Calendar 18 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Hearing: 4/15/14, Room 103, State House, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 13 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Finance |
2014-03-25 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0881h (NT) Motion Adopted Div 188-119 |
2014-03-25 | House | Amendment #2014-0881h (New Title) Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0881h (New Title) |
2014-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 3/06/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2014-02-21 | House | ===CONTINUED=== Division I Work Session: 3/06/2014 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212 |
2014-02-20 | House | Division I Work Session: 3/4/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212 |
2014-02-12 | House | Division I Work Session: 2/18/2014 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212 |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to Finance |
2014-02-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0339h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-12 | House | Adopt Amendment #0339h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0339h (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 9 |
2014-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 2/4/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Children and Family Law |