NH HB1377 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to unemployment benefits for employees terminated for refusing to comply with a vaccine mandate.
Title
Relative to unemployment benefits for employees terminated for refusing to comply with a vaccine mandate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-1; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-24 | House | Executive Session: 02/24/2022 11:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2022-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 01/27/2022 2:30 p.m. State HouseReps Hall |
2021-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services |