NH HB1378 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Signed by Governor Hassan 05/19/2016; Chapter 88; Eff. 7/18/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to disabled voters requiring assistance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to disabled voters requiring assistance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-23HouseSigned by Governor Hassan 05/19/2016; Chapter 88; Eff. 7/18/2016
2016-05-12HouseEnrolled 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 46
2016-05-11SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/05/2016); Senate Journal 17
2016-04-21SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/21/2016; Senate Journal 14
2016-04-13SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/21/2016; Senate Calendar 15
2016-04-07SenateHearing: 04/13/2016, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 14
2016-03-22SenateIntroduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 10
2016-03-09HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0496h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 21
2016-03-09HouseAmendment #2016-0496h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 21
2016-02-25HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0496h for 03/09/2016 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 13
2016-02-10HouseExecutive Session: 02/18/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2016-02-16House==CONTINUED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/18/2016 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308
2016-02-16House==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/16/2016 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308
2016-02-02House==RECESSED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/02/2016 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 308
2016-01-28HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/28/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2016-01-28HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/26/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308
2016-01-07HousePublic Hearing: 01/12/2016 01:10 PM Legislative Office Building308
2016-02-11HouseIntroduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Election Law House Journal 4 P. 12

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback