NH HB1385 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to changes and additions to energy facilities.
Title
Relative to changes and additions to energy facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 13 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 5/15/14; Senate Calendar 18 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Hearing: 4/16/14, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 14 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2014-03-25 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0864h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-25 | House | Amendment #2014-0864h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0864h (Vote 11-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 19 |
2014-02-25 | House | ===CONTINUED=== Executive Session: 3/04/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2014-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 2/20/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 ===RECESSED=== |
2014-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/18/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2014-02-13 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 2/18/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2014-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/20/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2014-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 1/21/2014 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy |