NH HB1386 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to offers of judgments.
Title
Relative to offers of judgments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1207 | |
2012-02-14 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 22 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 14, PG.803 | |
2012-01-31 | House Executive Session: 2/7/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2012-01-18 | House Public Hearing: 1/25/2012 4:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-11-22 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 7, PG.353 |