NH HB1388 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to student religious liberties.
Title
Relative to student religious liberties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-21 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 13 |
2014-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 2/11/2014 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2014-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 1/28/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Education |