NH HB1400 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Hearing: 04/09/2024, Room 100, State House, 10:20 am; Senate Calendar 14
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Hearing: 04/09/2024, Room 100, State House, 10:20 am; Senate Calendar 14
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to residential parking spaces.
Title
Relative to residential parking spaces.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Hearing: 04/09/2024, Room 100, State House, 10:20 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-28 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0853h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-28 | House | Amendment # 2024-0853h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0853h (NT) 03/08/2024 (Vote 9-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 19 |
2024-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-02-20 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/08/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 02/16/2024 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Special Committee on Housing House Journal 1 |