NH HB1401 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the transfer of Silver Lake Park in the town of Hollis.
Title
Relative to the transfer of Silver Lake Park in the town of Hollis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 10 |
2024-01-17 | House | Executive Session: 01/10/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2024-01-17 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 01/10/2024 (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 4 P. 9 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 1 |