NH HB1415 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Introduced 03/07/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Introduced 03/07/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to PFAS facility liability.
Title
Relative to PFAS facility liability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 |
2024-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 02/21/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 14 |
2024-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2024-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2024 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 1 |