NH HB1426 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminating the vehicle inspection mandate for non-commercial vehicles.
Title
Eliminating the vehicle inspection mandate for non-commercial vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Casey Conley [D] | Rep. Kevin Craig [R] | Rep. Andrew Prout [R] | Rep. Matthew Santonastaso [R] |
Rep. Rosemarie Rung [D] | Rep. Peter Torosian [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-03-02 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2022 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building201-203 |
2021-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Transportation |