NH HB1427 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 P. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 P. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the regulation and licensure of deputy physicians.
Title
Establishing the regulation and licensure of deputy physicians.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 P. 11 |
2024-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 02/07/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 6 P. 5 |
2024-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2024 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 |