NH HB1433 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/17/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/93058607283 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/17/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/93058607283 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to develop a statewide strategy on tick management.
Title
Establishing a commission to develop a statewide strategy on tick management.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/17/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/93058607283 - Executive Session to Follow |
2020-02-19 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 14 |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 02/19/2020 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 10 |
2020-01-21 | House | Executive Session: 02/04/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2020-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources House Journal 1 P. 22 |