NH HB1436 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-17 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-17 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to unlawful possession of alcoholic beverages.
Title
Relative to unlawful possession of alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - House - OTPA (Y: 143 N: 185 NV: 19 Abs: 45) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | House | Died on Table |
2014-02-19 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. J. Webb) Motion Adopted Div 217-113 |
2014-02-19 | House | Recommit (Rep. Vaillancourt) |
2014-02-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate (Rep. Richardson) |
2014-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0369h Motion Failed Regular Calendar 143-185 |
2014-02-19 | House | Adopt Amendment #2014-0369h Amendment Adopted Div 167-131 |
2014-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Without Recomendation for Feb 19; House Calendar 11 |
2014-01-28 | House | Executive Session: 2/04/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2014-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 1/23/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |