NH HB1454 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Veto Sustained 09/16/2020: Regular Calendar 193-140 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to alternative learning credit rules of the state board of education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to alternative learning credit rules of the state board of education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-17 - House - Veto Override (Y: 0 N: 8 NV: 344 Abs: 36) [FAIL]
2020-07-01 - House - Concur (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 351 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - OTP (Y: 202 N: 142 NV: 18 Abs: 34) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-17HouseVeto Sustained 09/16/2020: Regular Calendar 193-140 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
2020-07-28HouseVetoed by Governor Sununu 07/24/2020
2020-07-10HouseEnrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 71
2020-07-10SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9
2020-06-30HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Myler): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 193-136 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 26
2020-06-16SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-1445s, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-16SenateCommittee Amendment # 2020-1445s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-05SenateThe following email will be monitored throughout the meeting by someone who can assist with and alert the committee to any technical issues: remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us or call (603-271-3043). Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate6. To view/listen to this hearing on YouTube, use this link: https://www.youtube.com/channel/UCjBZdtrjRnQdmg-2MPMiWrA Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate5. Webinar ID: 943 8186 9248 Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate4. Or iPhone one-tap: 13126266799,,94381869248# or 19292056099,,94381869248# Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate3. To listen via telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): 1-301-715-8592, or 1-312-626-6799 or 1-929-205-6099, or 1-253-215-8782, or 1-346-248-7799, or 1-669-900-6833 Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate2. To submit your testimony to the committee, please send all documents via email to remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate1. To sign-in and/or speak in support or opposition, please register in advance by using this link: https://www.zoom.us/webinar/register/WN_DxJlsaqKRR6W0xV8gOxVTQ Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateMembers of the public may attend using the following links: Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateCommittee members will receive secure Zoom invitations via email. Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateRemote Hearing: 06/10/2020, 02:15 pm, on proposed amendment # 2020-1348s; Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateRemote Hearing: 06/10/2020, 02:10 pm; Senate Calendar 22
2020-03-12Senate==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/17/2020, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 11
2020-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 7
2020-02-20HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 202-142 02/20/2020 House Journal 5 P. 10
2020-02-05HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2020-02-05HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/19/2020 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 30
2020-01-22HouseExecutive Session: 01/30/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207
2020-01-10HousePublic Hearing: 01/16/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207
2019-12-03HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 23

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2399&sy=2020&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1454
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&id=1500&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1500
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=55&sy=2020&lb=H&eb=HB1454&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1454&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2399
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=75&sy=2020&lb=S&eb=HB1454&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1454&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2399
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=187&sy=2020&lb=H&eb=HB1454&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1454&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2399
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=218&sy=2020&lb=H&eb=HB1454&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1454&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2399

Bill Comments

feedback