NH HB1457 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Hearing: 04/02/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:20 pm; Senate Calendar 13
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Hearing: 04/02/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:20 pm; Senate Calendar 13
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing penalties for driving over covered wooden bridges in vehicles that exceed posted limits and for vehicular damage to covered wooden bridges.
Title
Establishing penalties for driving over covered wooden bridges in vehicles that exceed posted limits and for vehicular damage to covered wooden bridges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 04/02/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:20 pm; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-14 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2024 House Journal 8 |
2024-03-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/05/2024 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/05/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-02-28 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/05/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-02-15 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 02/20/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-02-15 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/20/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-02-07 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/13/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2024 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 |