NH HB1460 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-27 - Signed by the Governor on 5/23/2014; Chapter 0027; Effective 7/22/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-27 - Signed by the Governor on 5/23/2014; Chapter 0027; Effective 7/22/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the date of appointment of inspectors of election.
Title
Relative to the date of appointment of inspectors of election.
Sponsors
Sen. James Gray [R] | Rep. Shawn Jasper [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-27 | House | Signed by the Governor on 5/23/2014; Chapter 0027; Effective 7/22/2014 |
2014-05-01 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 4/30/14) |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/17/14; Senate Calendar 14 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Hearing: 3/26/14, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs |
2014-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-21 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 14 |
2014-02-17 | House | Executive Session: 2/20/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/18/2014 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-02-12 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 2/13/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-02-05 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/13/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/16/2014 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Election Law |