NH HB1465 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 261-52; House Journal 23, PG.1289
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 261-52; House Journal 23, PG.1289
Summary
Establishing firefighter number plates.
Title
Establishing firefighter number plates.
Sponsors
Sen. John Gallus [R] | Rep. Paul Ingersoll [D] | Rep. Herbert Richardson [R] | Rep. Robert Theberge [R] |
Rep. Yvonne Thomas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 261-52; House Journal 23, PG.1289 | |
2010-03-03 | House Special Ordered to Next Session Without Objection; House Journal 20, PG.1180 | |
2010-03-03 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Theberge); House Journal 20 PG.1095 | |
2010-02-18 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for March 3 Consent Calendar (vote 15-0); House Calendar 17, PG.815 | |
2010-02-09 | House Continued Executive Session: 2/16/2010 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2010-02-03 | House Executive Session: 2/9/2010 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 ==RECESSED== | |
2010-01-26 | House Public Hearing: 2/4/2010 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 6, PG.241 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2176&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |