NH HB1467 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the penalty for driving after revocation or suspension.
Title
Relative to the penalty for driving after revocation or suspension.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Hearing: 04/10/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0479h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 25 |
2018-02-22 | House | Amendment # 2018-0479h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 25 |
2018-02-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0479h for 02/22/2018 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 16 |
2018-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2018 Legislative Office Building 204 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-11-03 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 11 |