NH HB1468 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the effects of increasing workers' compensation benefits and to study payment schedules for medical reimbursement.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the effects of increasing workers' compensation benefits and to study payment schedules for medical reimbursement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 19 |
2014-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 3/04/2014 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2014-02-11 | House | Public Hearing: 2/18/2014 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services |