NH HB1475 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on November 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-17 - House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/18/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206
Pending: House Constitutional Review & Statutory Recodification Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-17 - House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/18/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206
Pending: House Constitutional Review & Statutory Recodification Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to enforcement of interstate compacts.
Title
Relative to enforcement of interstate compacts.
Sponsors
Rep. Spec Bowers [R] | Rep. Seth Cohn [R] | Rep. Joshua Davenport [R] | Rep. Paul Ingbretson [R] |
Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. Andrew Manuse [R] | Rep. Dan McGuire [R] | Rep. Paul Mirski [R] |
Rep. Mark Warden [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-17 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/18/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2012-06-07 | House Referred to Constitutional Review and Statutory Recodification for Interim Study; House Calendar 45, PG.2432 | |
2012-03-28 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 30, PG.1759 | |
2012-03-22 | House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Mar 28 (Vote 11-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 25, PG.1507 | |
2012-03-12 | House Executive Session: 3/20/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2012-02-22 | House House Rules Suspension to Allow Reporting Deadline Be Moved to March 22, 2012 (Rep Itse): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by Necessary Two-Thirds Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1249 | |
2012-02-13 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/21/2012 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2011-12-21 | House Public Hearing: 1/31/2012 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 11:00 Amendment)== | |
2011-11-22 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Constitutional Review and Statutory Recodification; House Journal 7, PG. 357 |