NH HB1485 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 184-149 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 184-149 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to security deposits.
Title
Relative to security deposits.
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Ammon [R] | Rep. Mark McLean [R] | Rep. Michael Sylvia [R] | Rep. Steven Beaudoin [R] |
Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Rep. Richard Hinch [R] | Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - House - ITL (Y: 184 N: 149 NV: 22 Abs: 37) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 184-149 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 14 |
2018-03-16 | House | Suspend House Rule 65; extending deadline for action to 3/22/2018 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 69 |
2018-03-08 | House | Special Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49 |
2018-03-08 | House | Suspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125 |
2018-02-26 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2018-02-26 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 71 |
2018-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/14/2018 Legislative Office Building 208 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-11-03 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 12 |