NH HB1493 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the powers and duties of cooperative school district budget committees.
Title
Relative to the powers and duties of cooperative school district budget committees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-19 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 03/13/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 11 |
2024-03-07 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-03-06 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/11/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-17 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2024 12:45 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-12-11 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Education House Journal 1 |