NH HB1494 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Hearing: 04/16/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 15
Pending: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Hearing: 04/16/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 15
Pending: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to OHRVs.
Title
Relative to OHRVs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Hearing: 04/16/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-28 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1038h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-28 | House | Amendment # 2024-1038h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1038h 03/13/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 17 |
2024-03-06 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2024-02-14 | House | Public Hearing: 02/21/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2023-12-11 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 1 |