NH HB151 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 8 (Vote 15-2; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 8 (Vote 15-2; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to duties of inspectors of election.
Title
Relative to duties of inspectors of election.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-25 | House | Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 8 (Vote 15-2; Regular Calendar) |
2013-10-16 | House | Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/6/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-09-03 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/24/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-07-24 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/29/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-02-26 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 2/26/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 1/15/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 12, PG.184 |