NH HB151 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/04/2023; Chapter 14; eff: 05/04/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/04/2023; Chapter 14; eff: 05/04/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the issue of unmarried cohabitants, domestic partnerships, and common law marriage.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the issue of unmarried cohabitants, domestic partnerships, and common law marriage.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Maggiore [D] | Rep. Kate Murray [D] | Rep. Peggy Balboni [D] | Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] |
Sen. David Watters [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - OTP (Y: 199 N: 155 NV: 25 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/04/2023; Chapter 14; eff: 05/04/2023 |
2023-04-26 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 04/06/2023 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 04/13/2023); Senate Journal 14 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/30/2023; Senate Calendar 15 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Hearing: 03/21/2023, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced 02/22/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 199-155 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 64 |
2023-01-27 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2023-01-27 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass 01/17/23 (Vote 10-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 17 |
2023-01-20 | House | Executive Session: 01/17/2023 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Children and Family Law |