NH HB1518 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0983h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the alternative compliance payments for renewable energy obligations not met through the purchase of renewable energy credits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the alternative compliance payments for renewable energy obligations not met through the purchase of renewable energy credits.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0983h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020
2020-03-13HouseAmendment # 2020-0983h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020
2020-03-04HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0983h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 13-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 73
2020-02-21HouseExecutive Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2020-01-10HousePublic Hearing: 01/16/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-12-03HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 1 P. 25

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback