NH HB1521 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-03 - House Print Rep Campbell's Remarks in Permanent Journal (Rep Kurk): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 15, PG.736
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-03 - House Print Rep Campbell's Remarks in Permanent Journal (Rep Kurk): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 15, PG.736
Summary
Relative to funding of the New Hampshire rail transit authority.
Title
Relative to funding of the New Hampshire rail transit authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Bergin [R] | Rep. Neal Kurk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-03 | House Print Rep Campbell's Remarks in Permanent Journal (Rep Kurk): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 15, PG.736 | |
2010-02-03 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 15, PG.736 | |
2010-02-03 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Kurk); House Journal 15, PG.666 | |
2010-01-27 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 3 Consent Calendar (vote 14-0); House Calendar 11, PG.464 | |
2010-01-13 | House Executive Session: 1/27/2010 9:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 | |
2010-01-12 | House Public Hearing: 1/19/2010 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Public Works and Highways; House Journal 6, PG.243 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2571&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |