NH HB1540 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 6/16/2014; Chapter 0129; Effective 8/15/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 6/16/2014; Chapter 0129; Effective 8/15/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to least cost integrated resource plans filed by an electric utility.
Title
Relative to least cost integrated resource plans filed by an electric utility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-27 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/16/2014; Chapter 0129; Effective 8/15/2014 |
2014-05-28 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 5/15/14) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-15 | House | Concur with Senate Amendments (Rep Borden) Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1682s Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Sen. Woodburn Floor Amendment #2014-1682s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Without Objection, Special Ordered to end of the calendar, Motion Adopted Voice Vote, 2/3 necesssary |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Sen. Woodburn moved to reconsider the Ought to Pass with Amendment vote, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-08 | Senate | The Chair Rescinded OT3rdg |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Sen. Woodburn moved to reconsider Third Reading and Final Passage vote, Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1499s, 1642s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Sen. Woodburn Floor Amendment #2014-1642s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1499s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1499s, 5/1/14; Senate Calendar 16 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Hearing: 4/16/14, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 14 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2014-03-25 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0837h Motion Adopted Div 282-9 (Consent Calendar) |
2014-03-25 | House | Adopt Amendment #0837h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0837h (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) |
2014-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 3/04/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2014-02-19 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2014-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/20/2014 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2014-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/18/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2014-02-12 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 2/13/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2014-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/13/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2014-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/4/2014 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy |