NH HB1542 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/16/2024, Vote 5-0; Senate Calendar 19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/16/2024, Vote 5-0; Senate Calendar 19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to possession and presentation of safe boater education certificates.
Title
Relative to possession and presentation of safe boater education certificates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/16/2024, Vote 5-0; Senate Calendar 19 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Special Order to 05/16/2024, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2024 Senate Journal 11 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Ricciardi Moved to Remove HB 1542-FN from the Consent Calendar; 05/02/2024; Senate Journal 11 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Hearing: 04/16/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:20 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-28 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0745h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-28 | House | Amendment # 2024-0745h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0745h 03/13/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 18 |
2024-03-06 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2024-02-14 | House | Public Hearing: 02/21/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305 |
2023-12-11 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 1 |