NH HB1545 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 6/11/2014; Chapter 0105; Effective 8/10/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 6/11/2014; Chapter 0105; Effective 8/10/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to voting booths.
Title
Relative to voting booths.
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Hoelzel [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. James Gray [R] |
Rep. James Belanger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/11/2014; Chapter 0105; Effective 8/10/2014 |
2014-05-15 | House | Enrolled |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-07 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1317s (Rep. Cote) Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1317s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1317s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1317s, 4/17/14; Senate Calendar 14 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Hearing: 4/9/14, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 13 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Introduced 3/13/14 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs |
2014-03-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 13 |
2014-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 2/04/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 1/16/2014 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Election Law |