NH HB1549 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1474s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/18/2024; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1474s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/18/2024; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to buy-in amount deductions collected during the operation of games of chance.
Title
Relative to buy-in amount deductions collected during the operation of games of chance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1474s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/18/2024; Senate Journal 10 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-1474s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/18/2024; Senate Journal 10 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1474s, 04/18/2024, Vote 3-0; Senate Calendar 15 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Hearing: 03/27/2024, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 12 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2024 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 |
2024-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 02/14/2024 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 16 |
2024-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/14/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-02-07 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/13/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-01-17 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2024 12:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-12-11 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 1 |