NH HB1554 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Hearing: 05/07/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 18
Pending: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 9:40 am in Room 103, State House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Hearing: 05/07/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 18
Pending: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 9:40 am in Room 103, State House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to certified culvert maintainer program reporting and requiring the commissioner of the department of environmental services to regulate the cutting of native aquatic vegetation on submerged lands in lakes and establishing rulemaking authority for such regulation.
Title
Relative to certified culvert maintainer program reporting and requiring the commissioner of the department of environmental services to regulate the cutting of native aquatic vegetation on submerged lands in lakes and establishing rulemaking authority for such regulation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Hearing: 05/07/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 18 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-28 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0969h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-28 | House | Amendment # 2024-0969h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0969h (NT) 03/13/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 18 |
2024-03-06 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2024-03-06 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2024-0969h: 03/13/2024 10:15 am Legislative Office Building305 |
2024-02-14 | House | Public Hearing: 02/21/2024 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 305 |
2023-12-11 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 1 |