NH HB1555 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 201-137; House Journal 24, PG.1306-1308
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 201-137; House Journal 24, PG.1306-1308
Summary
Adding an exemption from immunization for conscientious beliefs.
Title
Adding an exemption from immunization for conscientious beliefs.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark McConkey [R] | Rep. Barbara Richardson [D] | Rep. John Roberts [R] | Rep. Suzanne Smith [D] |
Rep. Susan Wiley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 201-137; House Journal 24, PG.1306-1308 | |
2010-03-10 | House Special Ordered to Regular Place on Mar 11 Calendar, Without Objection; House Journal 23, PG.1294 | |
2010-02-16 | House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 19, PG.1030 | |
2010-02-16 | House Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 10 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 19, PG.1030 | |
2010-02-03 | House Executive Session: 2/16/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2010-01-28 | House Continued Public Hearing: 2/8/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205-207 | |
2010-01-20 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/2/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2010-01-06 | House Public Hearing: 1/28/2010 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 ==RECESSED== | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 6, PG.244 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2219&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |