NH HB1558 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the university system of New Hampshire to examine the disposition of children in state custody.
Title
Requiring the university system of New Hampshire to examine the disposition of children in state custody.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 20 |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 12 |
2016-01-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-01-22 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/03/2016 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-01-22 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/04/2016 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building207 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Education House Journal 4 P. 18 |