NH HB1572 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor on 5/27/2014; Chapter 0067; Effective 5/27/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor on 5/27/2014; Chapter 0067; Effective 5/27/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a permanent subcommittee of the health and human services oversight committee relative to Alzheimers disease and other related dementia and requiring certain training and education programs regarding Alzheimers disease and other related dementia.
Title
Establishing a permanent subcommittee of the health and human services oversight committee relative to Alzheimers disease and other related dementia and requiring certain training and education programs regarding Alzheimers disease and other related dementia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - House - OTPA (Y: 268 N: 59 NV: 22 Abs: 39) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | House | Signed by the Governor on 5/27/2014; Chapter 0067; Effective 5/27/2014 |
2014-05-14 | House | Enrolled |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2014-1566eba Adopted Voice Vote (In recess from 4/30/14) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment 1566e Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/17/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Hearing: 4/1/14, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:40 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Introduced 3/13/2014 and Referred to Health, Education and Human Services |
2014-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0298h Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 268-59 |
2014-03-12 | House | Adopt Amendment #2014-0836h (New Title) Amendment Failed Voice Vote |
2014-03-12 | House | Adopt Amendment #2014-0298h (New Title) Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-05 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Warden) |
2014-02-27 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2014-0298h (New Title) |
2014-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0298h (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 14 |
2014-02-17 | House | =RESCHEDULED= Executive Session: 2/20/2014 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-02-13 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Executive Session: 2/13/2104 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-02-05 | House | ==Rescheduled== Executive Session: 2/13/2104 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 2/6/2104 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 205 =Cancelled due to weather= |
2014-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 1/28/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-12-17 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |