NH HB1577 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to initiating amendments and corrections to birth records.
Title
Relative to initiating amendments and corrections to birth records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - OTPA (Y: 194 N: 109 NV: 48 Abs: 45) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0301h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 194-109 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 118 |
2020-03-12 | House | Amendment # 2020-0301h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 118 |
2020-03-04 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-03-04 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0301h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 15-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 58 |
2020-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2020-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/18/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2020-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2020 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 27 |