NH HB1580 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 294-84 02/08/2024 House Journal 4 P. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 294-84 02/08/2024 House Journal 4 P. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the prohibition of government procurement of electric vehicles containing components created through the use of forced labor.
Title
Relative to the prohibition of government procurement of electric vehicles containing components created through the use of forced labor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 294-84 02/08/2024 House Journal 4 P. 31 |
2024-01-30 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 01/24/2024 (Vote 12-0; Regular Calendar) |
2024-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 01/24/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 House Calendar 2 |
2024-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 House Calendar 2 |
2023-12-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 |