NH HB1583 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the identification of law enforcement vehicles.
Title
Relative to the identification of law enforcement vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 5 |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/13/2020 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 4 |
2020-01-21 | House | Executive Session: 01/28/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2020-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 27 |