NH HB1587 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor on 5/27/2014; Chapter 0068; Effective 7/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor on 5/27/2014; Chapter 0068; Effective 7/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the collection and disclosure of student data.
Title
Relative to the collection and disclosure of student data.
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Kurk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | House | Signed by the Governor on 5/27/2014; Chapter 0068; Effective 7/01/2014 |
2014-05-01 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 4/30/14) |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/17/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Hearing: 4/3/14, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Introduced 3/13/2014 and Referred to Health, Education and Human Services |
2014-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0839h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-12 | House | Adopt Amendment #0839h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0839h (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 14 |
2014-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 3/4/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2014-02-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/4/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2014-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/20/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2014-02-13 | House | Public Hearing: 2/20/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2014-02-04 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/13/2014 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2014-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/6/2014 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-12-17 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Education |