NH HB1599 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to mammography.
Title
Relative to mammography.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1307 | |
2012-02-22 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 7 (Vote 13-3; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1068 | |
2012-02-15 | House Executive Session: 2/21/2012 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2012-02-15 | House Continued Public Hearing: 2/21/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2012-01-11 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/14/2012 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 ==RECESSED== | |
2011-12-22 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 1/31/2012 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2011-12-19 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 7, PG. 361 |