NH HB1615 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/04/2018; Chapter 160; Eff. 8/3/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/04/2018; Chapter 160; Eff. 8/3/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to speed limits in work zones.
Title
Relative to speed limits in work zones.
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Smith [R] | Rep. Timothy Soucy [D] | Rep. John O'Connor [R] | Rep. Skip Rollins [R] |
Rep. Skip Cleaver [D] | Rep. Thomas Walsh [R] | Rep. James Grenier [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/04/2018; Chapter 160; Eff. 8/3/2018 |
2018-05-09 | House | Enrolled 05/03/2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/03/2018); Senate Journal 17 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Hearing: 04/17/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0524h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 58 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0524h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 58 |
2018-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0524h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 33 |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 17 |