NH HB1616 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Hearing: 04/17/2024, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 15
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Hearing: 04/17/2024, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 15
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to parental consent for student participation in Medicaid to schools program.
Title
Relative to parental consent for student participation in Medicaid to schools program.
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Gregory Hill [R] | Rep. Leah Cushman [R] | Rep. Lisa Mazur [R] |
Rep. Tony Lekas [R] | Rep. Keith Ammon [R] | Rep. Kevin Verville [R] | Rep. Emily Phillips [R] |
Rep. Jim Kofalt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | Hearing: 04/17/2024, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-28 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0716h: Motion Adopted DV 190-187 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-28 | House | Amendment # 2024-0716h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 03/18/2024 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 27 |
2024-03-07 | House | Executive Session: 03/18/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-02-22 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/06/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2024 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2024 02:45 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-12-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Education House Journal 1 |