NH HB1626 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Hearing: 04/23/2024, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am, on proposed non-germane amendment # 2024-1411s; Senate Calendar 16
Pending: Senate Election Law and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Hearing: 04/23/2024, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am, on proposed non-germane amendment # 2024-1411s; Senate Calendar 16
Pending: Senate Election Law and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the repeal of certain designated funds and relative to the apportionment of dog license fees.
Title
Relative to the repeal of certain designated funds and relative to the apportionment of dog license fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Hearing: 04/23/2024, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am, on proposed non-germane amendment # 2024-1411s; Senate Calendar 16 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Hearing: 04/02/2024, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2024 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 |
2024-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 02/20/2024 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 16 |
2024-02-15 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/20/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-02-15 | House | Public Hearing: 02/20/2024 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred to Ways and Means 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 |
2024-02-01 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 7 |
2024-01-17 | House | Executive Session: 01/08/2024 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-01-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 01/08/2024 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 4 P. 7 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/08/2024 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-12-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 1 |