NH HB1628 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/07/2016; Chapter 215; Eff. 1/1/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/07/2016; Chapter 215; Eff. 1/1/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to human trafficking involving persons under 18 years of age.
Title
Relative to human trafficking involving persons under 18 years of age.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Gallagher [R] | Rep. Carl Seidel [R] | Rep. Joseph Lachance [R] | Sen. Jeanie Forrester [R] |
Rep. Gregory Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 06/07/2016; Chapter 215; Eff. 1/1/2017 |
2016-05-23 | House | Enrolled 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 24 |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-11 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1357s (Rep. Tholl): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 3 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1357s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/21/2016; Senate Journal 14 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1357s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/21/2016 Senate Journal 14 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1357s, 04/21/2016; Senate Calendar 15 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Hearing: 03/22/2016, Room 100, State House, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Introduced 03/10/2016 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9 |
2016-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 14 |
2016-02-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/09/2016 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 9 |
2016-02-17 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 02/03/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-01-27 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/02/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2016-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 02/02/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building204 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 4 P. 21 |