NH HB1638 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/10/2016 House Journal 16 P. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/10/2016 House Journal 16 P. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the allocation of lottery revenues to schools.
Title
Relative to the allocation of lottery revenues to schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Leeman [R] | Rep. Dan McGuire [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/10/2016 House Journal 16 P. 16 |
2016-02-10 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Leeman): Motion Failed DV 158-188 02/10/2016 House Journal 16 P. 16 |
2016-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/10/2016 (Vote 16-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 9 |
2016-01-19 | House | Executive Session: 02/02/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building207 |
2016-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2016 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building207 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Education House Journal 4 P. 21 |