NH HB1643 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Modifying the new resident drivers' license transfer requirement.
Title
Modifying the new resident drivers' license transfer requirement.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Prout [R] | Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Rep. Leonard Turcotte [R] | Rep. Kevin Verville [R] |
Rep. Bob Greene [R] | Rep. Cody Belanger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-03-02 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-02-23 | House | Full Committee Subcommittee Work Session: 03/01/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-02-19 | House | Public Hearing: 02/22/2022 09:00 am State House Reps Hall |
2021-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Transportation |