NH HB1687 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Hearing: 04/02/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 13
Pending: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Hearing: 04/02/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 13
Pending: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to disposal of construction and demolition debris from state construction projects.
Title
Relative to disposal of construction and demolition debris from state construction projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Hearing: 04/02/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0759h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment # 2024-0759h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 |
2024-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0759h 02/20/2024 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 8 |
2024-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-02-06 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/14/2024 03:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/13/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-12-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 1 |