NH HB1709 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/02/2024, Vote 4-0; Senate Calendar 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/02/2024, Vote 4-0; Senate Calendar 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the forest carbon commission.
Title
Establishing the forest carbon commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/02/2024, Vote 4-0; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Hearing: 04/09/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:50 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-21 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 |
2024-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/06/2024 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-02-28 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/06/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/06/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-02-28 | House | Public Hearing: 03/05/2024 12:15 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Ways and Means 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 |
2024-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0686h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 |
2024-02-22 | House | Amendment # 2024-0686h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 |
2024-02-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study |
2024-02-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0686h (NT) 02/14/2024 (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar) |
2024-02-07 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/14/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2024-01-31 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/07/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2024 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305 |
2023-12-19 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 1 |